Tankersley v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Kaiseem Tankersley
Defendant: The City of New York, Detective John Lombardi and John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv03359
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kaiseem Tankersley as to John Lombardi. (Uzoh, Ugochukwu)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted as to the City of New York only. The City of New York must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 2, 2019. In light of the extensive delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid needlessly delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than July 12, 2019, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the arrest at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than July 19, 2019, the plaintiff must execute any such release and (c) no later than September 3, 2019, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in the arrest at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, J.r on 7/4/2019 (Entered 7/5/2019). (Several, Emily)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The City of New York. (Levin, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Levin on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Levin, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaiseem Tankersley. John Lombardi served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019; The City of New York served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. (Uzoh, Ugochukwu)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Lombardi, The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5, John Lombardi, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11550251 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Kaiseem Tankersley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Uzoh, Ugochukwu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tankersley v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Joshua Michael Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective John Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe and Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiseem Tankersley
Represented By: Ugochukwu Uzoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?