Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elgazzar et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Mahmoud Said Hassan Elgazzar, Tarboosh Restaurant Inc. and Imad A Skaf
Case Number: 1:2019cv03391
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Imad A Skaf. (Ramesar, Thameera)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tarboosh Restaurant Inc., Imad A Skaf, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons as to Defendant, Imad A. Skaf) (Lonstein, Julie)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER #11 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. The Court grants plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint with a new defendant. The amended Complaint was not, however, attached to plaintiff's submission as Exhibit A. Plaintiff shall file the new pleading by July 18, 2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/16/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, and Amend Caption by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Notice of Partial Dismissal as to Defendant, Mahmoud Said Hassan Elgazzar, ONLY (Lonstein, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Tarboosh Restaurant Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Tarboosh summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mahmoud Said Hassan Elgazzar, Tarboosh Restaurant Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11553967 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Defendant, Mahmoud Said Hassan Elgazzar, #3 Proposed Summons as to Defendant, Tarboosh Restaurant Inc.) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Elgazzar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahmoud Said Hassan Elgazzar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarboosh Restaurant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imad A Skaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?