Troia v. TFP1 INC. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Troia
Defendant: Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, Antonio Biondi and TFP1 INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03400
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TFP1 INC. (Gutstein, Keith)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint, Cause of Action Ten, Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC.. (Rosenblum, Erika)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 8/1/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 8/21/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 8/15/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/9/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troia. TFP1 INC. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (O'Connell, Kelly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC.. (Gutstein, Keith)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troia. Robert Catalano served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troia. Fabio Migliaccio served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Troia. Antonio Biondi served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Hannah Rosenblum on behalf of Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC. (aty to be noticed) (Rosenblum, Erika)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Gutstein on behalf of Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC. (aty to be noticed) (Gutstein, Keith)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to TFP1 INC.. (Attachments: #1 TFPI Inc. Summons) (Piper, Francine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio. (Attachments: #1 Catalano Summons, #2 Migliaccio Summons) (Piper, Francine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Michael Troia (O'Connell, Kelly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonio Biondi, Robert Catalano, Fabio Migliaccio, TFP1 INC. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11555151 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Michael Troia. (O'Connell, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troia v. TFP1 INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Troia
Represented By: Kelly L. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Catalano
Represented By: Keith J. Gutstein
Represented By: Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabio Migliaccio
Represented By: Keith J. Gutstein
Represented By: Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Biondi
Represented By: Keith J. Gutstein
Represented By: Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFP1 INC.
Represented By: Keith J. Gutstein
Represented By: Erika Hannah Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?