Almonte v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Walkiris Almonte
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Department National Stores Bank d/b/a Macys and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03524
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. Plaintiff and a representative of defendant must appear at initial conference. Failure to attend in person may result in sanctions. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 8/26/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/8/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walkiris Almonte. Department National Stores Bank d/b/a Macys waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Horowitz, Uri)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/19/2019. The parties are respectfully reminded that all non-dispositive pretrial civil matters are handled by the assigned magistrate judge, and motions are to be addressed accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 7/10/2019. (Galpert, Aviva)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, until and including August 19, 2019 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Scott, Neil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Scott, Neil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Conner Scott on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Scott, Neil)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 7/8/2019. (Galpert, Aviva)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walkiris Almonte. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walkiris Almonte. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Horowitz, Uri)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department National Stores Bank d/b/a Macys, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11576661 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Walkiris Almonte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Department National Stores Bank d/b/a Macys) (Horowitz, Uri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almonte v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department National Stores Bank d/b/a Macys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Conner Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkiris Almonte
Represented By: Uri Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?