Adams v. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Victor Adams
Defendant: Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03548
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d). The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). (Credle, Rita)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 8/26/2019 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 8/22/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/29/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Victor Adams. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Barshay, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Victor Adams (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11580324 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Victor Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Adams
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?