Rosales v. Bronfman-Igtet
Plaintiff: Omar W. Rosales
Defendant: Sara Bronfman-Igtet
Case Number: 1:2019cv03576
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Omar W. Rosales. Complaint, Filing Fee Receipt and Summons was returned. (Piper, Francine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to forward. Mail sent to Omar W. Rosales. Rule 73 and Pro Se Registration and Consent to Electronic Notification returned (Piper, Francine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sara Bronfman-Igtet. (Williams, Erica)
June 14, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653140963 (Williams, Erica)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sara Bronfman-Igtet, filed by Omar W. Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Bronfman-Igtet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar W. Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Bronfman-Igtet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?