Hardwick v. Goss, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Izaya Hardwick
Defendant: Goss, Inc. and Victor Technologies International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03667
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. DeSantis on behalf of Goss, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (DeSantis, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Victor Technologies International, Inc. by Goss, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Strongin, Howard)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/1/2019. (Ferrara, Alicia)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Stipulation extending defendant time to answer) by Goss, Inc.. (Strongin, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Goss, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by Goss, Inc. (Strongin, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Notice: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Goss, Inc. from Supreme Court Kings County, case number 510987/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11602800) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Rule 7.1, #4 Jury Demand) (Strongin, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardwick v. Goss, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izaya Hardwick
Represented By: Scott W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goss, Inc.
Represented By: Howard F. Strongin
Represented By: Michael J. DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Technologies International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?