Buzil v. Chen
Plaintiff: Elliot Buzil
Defendant: Jianou Chen
Case Number: 1:2019cv03669
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on September 5, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jianou Chen. (Gertzer, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Keith Gertzer on behalf of Jianou Chen (aty to be noticed) (Gertzer, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION #2 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 6/26/2019. (Marziliano, August)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Elliot Buzil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt for 1st Payment, #2 Exhibit Receipt for 2nd Payment, #3 Exhibit Receipt for 3rd Payment) (Mele, Armand)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jianou Chen. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jianou Chen against Elliot Buzil filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11603019 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Elliot Buzil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mele, Armand) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019: #2 Proposed Summons) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buzil v. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Buzil
Represented By: Armand P. Mele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jianou Chen
Represented By: Michael Keith Gertzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?