Brozoski v. Long Island Rail Road Company

Plaintiff: Owen Brozoski
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03717
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Island Rail Road Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority for Long Island Rail Road Company. (Mevorach, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Mevorach, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting, on consent #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Long Island Rail Road Company answer is due 7/31/2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 7/18/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until July 31, 2019 by Long Island Rail Road Company. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer) (Mevorach, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Pearce Mevorach on behalf of Long Island Rail Road Company (aty to be noticed) (Mevorach, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Brozoski. Long Island Rail Road Company served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Lauriello, Valerie)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Long Island Rail Road Company. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Rail Road Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11610976 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Owen Brozoski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lauriello, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brozoski v. Long Island Rail Road Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Rail Road Company
Represented By: Daniel Pearce Mevorach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen Brozoski
Represented By: Valerie J. Lauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?