Lowery v. Fire Talk LLC
Plaintiff: Deborah Lowery
Defendant: Fire Talk LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03737
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default: The Clerk having noted default against the Defendant Fire Talk LLC in this matter on August 21, 2019, Plaintiff is directed move for default judgment by September 5, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/22/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Fire Talk LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Fire Talk LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Deborah Lowery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Certificate of Default) (Freeman, James)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Deborah Lowery: A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that there has been no activity in this case since the SUMMONS was returned executed and filed with the Court on 7/8/2019. No later than August 14, 2019 one of the following events must occur: (a) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendants time to answer, (b) the plaintiff must file a motion for the entry of a notation of default or (c) the defendant must file an answer. If, none of the preceding events occurs by the deadlines set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiffs counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/31/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Lowery. Fire Talk LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fire Talk LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fire Talk LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11613146 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Deborah Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery v. Fire Talk LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Talk LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lowery
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?