MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD v. NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD
Defendant: Express Trade Capital, Inc., Swift Transportation Limited, American Shipping and Logistics Inc., Bank Leumi USA, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. and NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03750
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Weiss, Andrea)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION extending time to answer complaint by NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc., Swift Transportation Limited (Moulinos, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Leumi USA. (Seidman, Lon)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. answer due 8/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/24/2019. (Marino, Janine)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Everett Swearingen on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Swearingen, Walter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Weiss, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Weiss, Andrea)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Trade Capital, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Seidman, Lon)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Express Trade Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Seidman, Lon)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. Swift Transportation Limited served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. Express Trade Capital, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. Bank Leumi USA served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. American Shipping and Logistics Inc. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Rubin, Howard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Shipping and Logistics Inc., Bank Leumi USA, Express Trade Capital, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc., Swift Transportation Limited filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11615800 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Rubin, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD v. NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAM Apparel & Textiles LTD
Represented By: Howard M. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Trade Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Lon J. Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Shipping and Logistics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Leumi USA
Represented By: Lon J. Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Andrea Likwornik Weiss
Represented By: Walter Everett Swearingen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCL Worldwide Logistics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?