Tkachenko v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: DMITRY TKACHENKO
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, District Director Thomas Cioppa, Attorney General William P. Barr, Acting Sec. Kevin K. McAleenan and Director of F.B.I. Christopher Wray
Case Number: 1:2019cv03764
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT, It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs Complaint and all claims therein are dismissed without costs or attorneys fees to any party; and that this dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiffs right to reinstate this action if United States Citizenship and Immigration Services does not render a decision on Plaintiffs application for naturalization (Form N-400) within thirty (30) days of entry of judgment. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 7/30/2019. (Piper, Francine)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's Complaint and all claims therein are hereby dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, without costs or attorneys' fees to any party, subject to the provisions of paragraph 2 herein. This dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to reinstate this action if United States Citizenship and Immigration Services does not render a decision on Plaintiff's application for naturalization (Form N-400) within thirty (30) days of entry of judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a judgment in accordance with this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/26/2019. (Brucella, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice for the Court's endorsement by William P. Barr, Thomas Cioppa, L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray (Olds, Dara)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dmitry Tkachenko. William P. Barr served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Thomas Cioppa served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; L. Francis Cissna served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; Christopher Wray served on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Vassilieva, Natalia)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The United States Attorney, as attorney for defendants, is directed to show cause on or before 9/10/2019, in writing, why a writ of mandamus should not be issued, and shall serve a copy of the response on plaintiff, with proof of such service to the Clerk of this Court; On or before 10/1/2019, plaintiff shall file her reply, if any, with proof of service to the Clerk of this Court; Oral argument shall be heard on 10/25/2019 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/10/2019. (Brucella, Michelle)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Thomas Cioppa, L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by DMITRY TKACHENKO (Vassilieva, Natalia) .
July 2, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT BY DMITRY TKACHENKO against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by DMITRY TKACHENKO. Filing Fee $400 Paid (Receipt # ANYEDC-11616858) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Interview Results, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - USCIS Inquiries) (Vassilieva, Natalia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #5 Proposed Summons) (Davis, Kimberly).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tkachenko v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William P. Barr
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Sec. Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of F.B.I. Christopher Wray
Represented By: Dara A Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DMITRY TKACHENKO
Represented By: Natalia Vassilieva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?