Toth v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Jerry Geza Toth
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv03821
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendant's letter motion for pre-motion conference is DENIED #7 . Defendant shall serve its motion to dismiss by August 15, 2019. Plaintiff shall serve his opposition by September 12, 2019. Defendant shall serve its reply, if any, and electronically file the fully-briefed motion by September 26, 2019. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 8/2/2019. (Valentin, Winnethka)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defendant's motion to dismiss, #5 First MOTION for Leave to File Document (Request for an order referring the case for mediation) and case law authorities filed by Jerry Geza Toth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The defendant served an untimely IEP eight days after the school year had begun., #2 Exhibit Administrative procedures do not provide an appropriate remedy., #3 Exhibit The system fails to provide the focus on the particular child that is at the core of the IDEA, #4 Exhibit The Keswell School provides an individualized program meeting T.T.'s unique needs., #5 Exhibit The Keswell School costs $67,000 less than pendency.) (Toth, Jerry)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference in anticipation of Defendant's motion to dismiss by New York City Department of Education. (Koroleva, Lana)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lana Koroleva on behalf of New York City Department of Education (aty to be noticed) (Koroleva, Lana)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File Document (Request for an order referring the case for mediation) by Jerry Geza Toth. (Toth, Jerry)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Geza Toth. New York City Department of Education served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York City Department of Education. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653141313 (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, filed by Jerry Geza Toth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toth v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Lana Koroleva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Geza Toth
Represented By: Jerry Geza Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?