P. et al v. CHA Health Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A. P. and Y. Z.
Defendant: JOSHUA J. BERGER, MD, CHA Health Systems, Inc., COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC, Simon Hong, Ph.D., CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., D/B/A CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES, CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., d/b/a COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES, Joshua J. Berger, M.D. and Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03826
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Perrie M. Weiner on behalf of Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Weiner, Perrie)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/23/2019. (Li, Natalie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Selmeci on behalf of CHA Health Systems, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Selmeci, Judy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11786085. by Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc., Simon Hong, Ph.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Perrie Weiner in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing State Bar of California) (Weiner, Perrie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. P., Y. Z.. Simon Hong, Ph.D. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Greenberg, Michelle)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick C. Johs on behalf of Joshua J. Berger, MD (aty to be noticed) (Johs, Frederick)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hurley McGay on behalf of Joshua J. Berger, MD (aty to be noticed) (McGay, Jennifer)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. P., Y. Z.. Joshua J. Berger, MD waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. P., Y. Z.. CHA Fertility Center Los Angeles waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. P., Y. Z.. Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by A. P., Y. Z.. CHA Health Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 7/25/2019. (Kuntz, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joshua J. Berger, MD, CHA Fertility Center Los Angeles, CHA Health Systems, Inc., Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc., Simon Hong, Ph.D. (Attachments: #1 Comprehensive Health, #2 Cha Health Systems Inc dba Cha Fertility Ctr LA, #3 Cha Fertility Center LA, #4 Joshua J. Berger MD, #5 Cha Health Systems Inc dba Comp Hlth for All Frtlty Med Gr Inc, #6 Simon Hong PhD) (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by A. P., Y. Z. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Document by A. P., Y. Z.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Greenberg, Michelle)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES, CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., D/B/A CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES, CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., d/b/a COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC., CHA Health Systems, Inc., COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC, JOSHUA J. BERGER, MD, Simon Hong, Ph.D. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11625974 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Y. Z., A. P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greenberg, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. et al v. CHA Health Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA J. BERGER, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHA Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Judy Selmeci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Hong, Ph.D.
Represented By: Perrie M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., D/B/A CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHA HEALTH SYSTEMS, INC., d/b/a COMPREHENSIVE HEALTH FOR ALL FERTILITY MEDICAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHA FERTILITY CENTER LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua J. Berger, M.D.
Represented By: Frederick C. Johs
Represented By: Jennifer Hurley McGay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Health for all Fertility Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Perrie M. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. Z.
Represented By: Michelle Lynn Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?