Martinez et al v. Rivera
Plaintiff: Sandy Martinez, Jamal Williams and Naomi Zeltser
Defendant: Margarita Rivera
Case Number: 1:2019cv03829
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Allyne R Ross
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Margarita Rivera (Vickers, Alyssa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 Jamal Williams ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jamal Williams. (Lanza, Craig)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 Naomi Zeltser ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Margarita Rivera by Naomi Zeltser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lanza, Craig)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margarita Rivera. Naomi Zeltser served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Naomi Zeltser) (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER consent granting #15 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of the parties, the 8/29/2019 Initial Conference is rescheduled to 9/11/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #11 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 8/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/29/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: During the upcoming initial conference, counsel must be prepared to discuss whether the probate exception to federal court jurisdiction applies in this action, and whether the action should be remanded to state court. See, e.g., Architectural Body Research Foundation v. Reversible Destiny Foundation, 335 F. Supp. 3d 621 (S.D.N.Y. 2018); Abercrombie v. Andrew College, 438 F. Supp. 2d 243 (S.D.N.Y. 2006). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/29/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Jamal Williams, Naomi Zeltser. (Lanza, Craig)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Stuart Lanza on behalf of Jamal Williams (notification declined or already on case) (Lanza, Craig)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Stuart Lanza on behalf of Naomi Zeltser (aty to be noticed) (Lanza, Craig)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Naomi Zeltser. (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 8/29/2019 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 8/22/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/23/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan M. Mandel on behalf of Margarita Rivera (aty to be noticed) (Mandel, Evan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Margarita Rivera (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Margarita Rivera re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sandy Martinez, Jamal Williams, Naomi Zeltser by Margarita Rivera. (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal by Margarita Rivera (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Margarita Rivera re #1 Notice of Removal on Plaintiffs' Counsel (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Margarita Rivera re #1 Notice of Removal on Supreme Court, Kings County (Vickers, Alyssa)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Margarita Rivera from Supreme Court of New York, Kings County, case number 511418/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11626570) (Vickers, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita Rivera
Represented By: Alyssa Leah Vickers
Represented By: Evan M. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Martinez
Represented By: Craig Stuart Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Williams
Represented By: Craig Stuart Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Zeltser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?