Milton v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Milton
Defendant: Rosicki Rosicki and Associates, P.C., Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq., Dawn Polewac, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Tom Rosicki, Paramount Land, Inc., Craig Wolfson, Kelly Ann Poole, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2, Enterprise Process Service, Inc., WMC Mortgage Corporation, RAS Boriskin, LLC and Cynthia Rosicki
Case Number: 1:2019cv03934
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 Motions for Pre-Motion Conference; Adjourning Pre-motion Conference. On July 24, 2019, the plaintiff was directed to respond to the defendants' pre-motion conference letters by August 2, 2019. The plaintiff has not filed a response. Accordingly, the pre-motion conference scheduled for August 14, 2019, is adjourned to September 18, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4G North. The plaintiff is directed to respond to the defendants' pre-motion conference letters by August 23, 2019. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 8/6/2019. (Tuminelli, Amanda)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for pre motion conference by Craig Wolfson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for pre motion conference by Cynthia Rosicki, Tom Rosicki, Rosicki Rosicki and Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for pre motion conference by Dawn Polewac, Kelly Ann Poole. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for pre motion conference by Paramount Land, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for pre motion conference by Enterprise Process Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Enterprise Process Service, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Craig Wolfson (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Cynthia Rosicki, Tom Rosicki, Rosicki Rosicki and Associates, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Morganstern on behalf of Paramount Land, Inc., Dawn Polewac, Kelly Ann Poole (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Morganstern, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The plaintiff is directed to respond to the arguments raised in both letters seeking a pre-motion conference #5 , #8 by August 2, 2019. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 7/25/2019. (Tuminelli, Amanda)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for pre motion conference by Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq, RAS Boriskin, LLC. (Battista, Joseph)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The plaintiff is directed to respond to the defendant's letter #5 requesting a pre-motion conference by August 2, 2019. The pre-motion conference will be held on August 14, 2019 at 12:30 p.m., in Courtroom 4G North. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Practices and Rules, specifically, Rule 4(A). Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 7/24/2019. (Tuminelli, Amanda) Modified on 7/24/2019 to add the time of the conference(Greene, Donna).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Yohay, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Yohay, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Letter to District Judge Donnelly for Pre-Motion Conference by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Yohay, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2 identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2. (Yohay, David)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC from Queens County Supreme Court, case number 708348/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11641325) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yohay, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosicki Rosicki and Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Z. Boriskin, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Polewac
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: David Yohay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rosicki
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Land, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wolfson
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Ann Poole
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Captial I Inc. Trust 2004-WMC2
Represented By: David Yohay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Process Service, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAS Boriskin, LLC
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Rosicki
Represented By: Andrew C. Morganstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Milton
Represented By: John Peter DeMaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?