Rozman v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abraham Rozman
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Bank Of America, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Discover Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv03945
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Discover Bank. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 9/20/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/6/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
September 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Fiano, Talia) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct motion type. (Quinlan, Krista).
September 3, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: anticipated motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Abraham Rozman. (Force, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re: anticipated motion to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
August 7, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Discover Bank. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 9/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/6/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fiano, Talia) Modified on 8/6/2019 to correct motion type. (Quinlan, Krista).
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discover Bank (Fiano, Talia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Klein, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 8/26/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/31/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Schaeffer on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Schaeffer, Seth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abraham Rozman. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Force, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abraham Rozman. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Force, David)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Bank Of America, N.A. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 9/4/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/19/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/22/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank Of America, N.A.. (Massand, Shan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shan P. Massand on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Massand, Shan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abraham Rozman. Bank Of America, N.A. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Force, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abraham Rozman. Discover Bank served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Force, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/11/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Abraham Rozman against Bank Of America, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Discover Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11643260 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Abraham Rozman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Force, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozman v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Shan P. Massand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: Seth A. Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Talia Nella Fiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Rozman
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?