Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lawler et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Natalie Bannister and William Scott Lawler
Case Number: 1:2019cv04025
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Peggy Kuo
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant William Scott Lawler to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 10, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/9/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L Francoeur on behalf of William Scott Lawler (aty to be noticed) (Francoeur, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Letter for extension of time to answer by William Scott Lawler (Francoeur, Joseph) Modified on 9/9/2019 to reflect that this is a motion. (Riquelme, Claudia).
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Natalie Bannister waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Kim, Hane)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Natalie Bannister. (Almonte, Giselle)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission (Kim, Hane)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. William Scott Lawler waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Kim, Hane)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kathleen Vakiener on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Vakiener, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/15/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Hane L Kim on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Hane)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P McGrath on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (McGrath, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Natalie Bannister, William Scott Lawler Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berger, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lawler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Lawler
Represented By: Joseph L Francoeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kevin P McGrath
Represented By: Hane L Kim
Represented By: Marc P. Berger
Represented By: Jennifer Kathleen Vakiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?