Yaqoob v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Baber Yaqoob
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa, Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan, US Atty General William Barr and Kenneth CUCINNELLI
Respondent: Director, F.B.I. Christopher Wray and Acting Director Kenneth T. Cucinelli, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv04050
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Regarding the Court's Standing Order by William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Kenneth T. Cucinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray (Priore, Shana)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shana C. Priore on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Kenneth T. Cucinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Christopher Wray (aty to be noticed) (Priore, Shana)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baber Yaqoob. William Barr served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Thomas Cioppa served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Kenneth T. Cucinelli, II served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Christopher Wray served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Donnard, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Cioppa, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Petition for Naturalization Hearing by Baber Yaqoob (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Donnard, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Naturalization Hearing filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11659203, filed by Baber Yaqoob. (Donnard, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yaqoob v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth CUCINNELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baber Yaqoob
Represented By: Brian Donnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, F.B.I. Christopher Wray
Represented By: Shana C. Priore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cucinelli, II
Represented By: Shana C. Priore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?