New York Life Insurance Company v. Cesar et al
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Neige Cesar, Marie Marcelle Cesar, Samantha Cesar, Romario Cesar and A.C., a Minor
Case Number: 1:2019cv04107
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against A.C., a Minor, Marie Marcelle Cesar by Romario Cesar, Neige Cesar, Samantha Cesar. (Friedman, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Friedman on behalf of Neige Cesar, Romario Cesar, Samantha Cesar (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, Daniel)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #3 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit. New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation (the "Company") has filed its complaint in interpleader and has requested permission to present its check in the sum of $500,282.32 plus applicable claim interest, if any, payable to the Clerk of this Court, as a deposit into the registry of this Court of death benefits payable under Term Life Policy Number 48407321 (the "Policy") and by reason of the death of Marionmi Cesar. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 7/18/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Deposit Funds) (Pyun, Grace)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New York Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for New York Life Insurance Company. (Pyun, Grace)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against A.C., a Minor, Marie Marcelle Cesar, Neige Cesar, Romario Cesar, Samantha Cesar filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11667823, filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons as to Neige Cesar, #9 Proposed Summons as to Marie Marcelle Cesar, #10 Proposed Summons as to Romario Cesar, #11 Proposed Summons as to Samantha Cesar, #12 Proposed Summons as to A.C., a Minor) (Pyun, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Life Insurance Company v. Cesar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neige Cesar
Represented By: Daniel Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Marcelle Cesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Cesar
Represented By: Daniel Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romario Cesar
Represented By: Daniel Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C., a Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Grace Pyun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?