Watthanawongwat v. Quintana et al
Plaintiff: Chidensee Watthanawongwat
Defendant: Susan Quintana and Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv04122
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 8/1/2019. (Greene, Donna)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice for the Court's endorsement by Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana (Balaban, Rachel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel G. Balaban on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Balaban, Rachel)
July 17, 2019 The case of Watthanawongwat v. Quintana et al, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19-cv-6144. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. ENDORSEMENT: The Court may transfer a case "[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court may also transfer a case based on the consent of the parties. 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Plaintiff, the only party to appear in this case, has consented to transfer to the Eastern District of New York. Accordingly, the Court orders that this case be transferred to the Eastern District. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/16/2019) (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. (Gottfried, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by July 16, 2019 as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. In that submission, the Court also expects to be informed of Plaintiff's position regarding a potential transfer to the Eastern District of New York as an alternative to dismissal. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on Defendants and retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/8/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Michael Gottfried. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:552(a); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 08:1447; the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Michael Gottfried. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottfried, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana.Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat.(Gottfried, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Michael Gottfried. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Gottfried to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/8/2019. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Susan Quintana served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. (Gottfried, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17174953).Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat.(Gottfried, David) Modified on 7/2/2019 (pc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watthanawongwat v. Quintana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chidensee Watthanawongwat
Represented By: David Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Quintana
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Rachel G. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?