Williams v. Polymeropoulos et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Williams
Defendant: Howard H. Pien, Richard W. Dugan, Vincent J. Milano, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, H. Thomas Watkins, James P. Kelly, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Kenneth M. Bate and Michael F. Cola
Case Number: 1:2019cv04293
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OROTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT and granting parties' #10 Motion. It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed that Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up until sixty days after entry of this Order, at, which point the Defendants shall answer or file pre-motion conference letters. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 9/13/2019. (See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) by Kenneth M. Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James P. Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Howard H. Pien, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., H. Thomas Watkins. (Feldman, Brad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Soloway, Audra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Feldman on behalf of Kenneth M. Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James P. Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Howard H. Pien, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., H. Thomas Watkins (aty to be noticed) (Feldman, Brad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Audra J. Soloway on behalf of Kenneth M. Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James P. Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Howard H. Pien, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., H. Thomas Watkins (aty to be noticed) (Soloway, Audra)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer on behalf of Kenneth M. Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James P. Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Howard H. Pien, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., H. Thomas Watkins (aty to be noticed) (Kramer, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M Donnelly, Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/29/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Samuel Williams (Nespole, Gregory)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth M. Bate, Michael F. Cola, Richard W. Dugan, James P. Kelly, Vincent J. Milano, Howard H. Pien, Mihael H. Polymeropoulos, Gian Piero Reverberi, Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc., H. Thomas Watkins filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11699763 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Samuel Williams. (Nespole, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Polymeropoulos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard H. Pien
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Dugan
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J. Milano
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mihael H. Polymeropoulos
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Thomas Watkins
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Kelly
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gian Piero Reverberi
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Bate
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Cola
Represented By: Audra J. Soloway
Represented By: Brad Feldman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Williams
Represented By: Gregory M. Nespole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?