Zuffa, LLC v. Samuel et al
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Defendant: Anand Samuel, Night Samuel, Cream Restaurant Corp. and Chef Diablo
Case Number: 1:2019cv04308
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 10/22/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/22/2019. (Caggiano, Diana)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zuffa, LLC. Anand Samuel served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zuffa, LLC. Cream Restaurant Corp. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cream Restaurant Corp., Anand Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Cream summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship (Lonstein, Julie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cream Restaurant Corp., Anand Samuel filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11701895 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Zuffa, LLC d/b/a Ultimate Fighting Championship. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to deft., Anand Samuel, #3 Proposed Summons as to deft., Cream Restaurant Corp.) (Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuffa, LLC v. Samuel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Night Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cream Restaurant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chef Diablo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuffa, LLC
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?