Curtis v. Growing Up Green Charter School
Plaintiff: Eric Curtis
Defendant: Growing Up Green Charter School
Case Number: 1:2019cv04509
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/23/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Curtis (Wade, Locksley)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam I. Kleinberg on behalf of Growing Up Green Charter School (aty to be noticed) (Kleinberg, Adam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Growing Up Green Charter School. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Eric Curtis (Wade, Locksley)
August 9, 2019 SECOND NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 8/12/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Eric Curtis (Wade, Locksley)
August 7, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Eric Curtis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Wade, Locksley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Growing Up Green Charter School filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11732389 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by Eric Curtis. (Wade, Locksley) Modified on 8/9/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Growing Up Green Charter School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growing Up Green Charter School
Represented By: Adam I. Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Curtis
Represented By: Locksley O. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?