Pottash v. Hello Living, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ayelet Pottash
Defendant: Mike Woodson, Hello Living, LLC and Eli Karp
Case Number: 1:2019cv04530
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion for extension of time to answer #11 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 11/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/18/2019. (Silberstein, Hope)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hello Living, LLC, Eli Karp, Mike Woodson. (Turoff, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 11/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time Defendant makes an appearance with in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/15/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/20/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayelet Pottash. Mike Woodson waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Goddard, Megan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayelet Pottash. Eli Karp waiver sent on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Goddard, Megan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ayelet Pottash. Hello Living, LLC waiver sent on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Goddard, Megan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Ayelet Pottash (Goddard, Megan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Ayelet Pottash (Goddard, Megan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hello Living, LLC, Eli Karp, Mike Woodson filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11735204 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Ayelet Pottash. (Goddard, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pottash v. Hello Living, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayelet Pottash
Represented By: Megan Sarah Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Woodson
Represented By: Brian J. Turoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hello Living, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Turoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Karp
Represented By: Brian J. Turoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?