Headley v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: NYPD Officers Jane and John Roes #1-3, NYPD Officer John Doe (Shield No. 7169) and Jazmine Headley
Defendant: Toyin Ramos-Williams, The City of New York, Juanita Alston, Shawndel Latham, Bettina Barnett-Weekes, HRA Peace Officers Richard and Rae Roe #1-3 and Mayra Rivera
Petitioner: Towaki Komatsu
Case Number: 1:2019cv04543
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re #8 Motion to Intervene: Movant's application to intervene is denied. Movant is cautioned that the filing of non-meritorious, frivolous motions of this kind will not be tolerated by the Court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal would not betaken in good faith, and therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States^ 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (C/mailed). SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/2/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Letter dated 10/1/19 from Towaki Komatsu to Judge Vitaliano, "urguing Your Honor to immediately act in accordance with US v. Smith, 426 F.3d, 567 (2d Cir. 2005) and Marom v. City of NY, #15-cv-2017 (PKC) (SDNY Mar. 7 2016) by imposing strict discipline upon the US Marshals Service and the federal Court Security Officers that work inside the courthouse, to no longer subject pltff to selective-enforcement nor any other acts by them that violate constitutional rights and other applicable laws that include 41 CFR sec. 102-74.390 and 18 USC sec. 1513; while pltff is inside the courthouse and conducting himself in a lawful manner." (Galeano, Sonia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 Letter dated 9/30/19 from Towaki Komatsu to Judge Vitaliano, seeking to inquire whether the Court has rendered a decision with regards to pltff's "request to intervene against the deft." Pltff further states that if the Court needs clarification regarding the contents discussed in this submission, pltff respectfully request a conference with the Court for that purpose. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 30, 2019 MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The parties will not be permitted to select a specific magistrate judge to preside over their settlement negotiations. The case is sent for prompt court-annexed mediation. (Henceforth, the Court will not consider any request for judicial action that has not been docketed as an ECF motion event.) Selection of Mediator due by 10/14/2019. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/30/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Letter JOINT REQUEST FOR MEDIATION by Jazmine Headley (Rosenfeld, Katherine)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated September 9, 2019 filed by pro se movant Towaki Komatsu. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 8/30/2019 Pages 1-9) (Almonte, Giselle)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Intervene filed by Towaki Komatsu. (Galeano, Sonia)
August 28, 2019 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Application #7 granted, on consent. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/28/2019. (Cardenas, Alex)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by The City of New York. (Funes, Suzanne)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Emily Funes on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Funes, Suzanne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Lerner Freeman on behalf of Jazmine Headley (aty to be noticed) (Freeman, Emma)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Juanita Alston, Shawndel Latham, NYPD Officer John Doe (Shield No. 7169), Toyin Ramos-Williams, Mayra Rivera, The City of New York. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juanita Alston, Bettina Barnett-Weekes, HRA Peace Officers Richard and Rae Roe #1-3, Shawndel Latham, NYPD Officer John Doe (Shield No. 7169), NYPD Officers Jane and John Roes #1-3, Toyin Ramos-Williams, Mayra Rivera, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11737446 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Jazmine Headley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - The City of New York, #3 Proposed Summons - HRA Sergeant Toyin Ramos-Williams, #4 Proposed Summons - HRA Peace Officer Mayra Rivera, #5 Proposed Summons - Juanita Alston, #6 Proposed Summons - NYPD Officer Shawndel Latham (Shield No. 19513), #7 Proposed Summons - NYPD Officer John Doe (Shield No. 7169)) (Rosenfeld, Katherine) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/9/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headley v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyin Ramos-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Suzanne Emily Funes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawndel Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettina Barnett-Weekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRA Peace Officers Richard and Rae Roe #1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayra Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYPD Officers Jane and John Roes #1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYPD Officer John Doe (Shield No. 7169)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmine Headley
Represented By: Katherine Ruth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Emma Lerner Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Towaki Komatsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?