Schmitt v. Federal National Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SCHMITT
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04544
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Federal National Mortgage Corporation (Mordkoff, David)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #9 Motion to Stay. This case is hereby stayed pending the exhaustion of Fannie Mae's appellate proceedings before New York State Courts in the foreclosure action brought by Fannie Mae against Schmitt concerning the same real property as at issue in this matter (N.Y. Sup. Ct.Richmond County Index No. 135724/2017; and App. Div. 2d Dep't Docket No. 2018-03366). Should the Appellate Division deny Fannie Mae's pending motion for reconsideration or for leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals, the stay in this matter shall remain in place until: (a) the expiration of Fannie Mae's time to make a subsequent motion to the Court of Appeals for leave to appeal, or, if Fannie Mae makes such a motion to the Court of Appeals, (b) entry of an orderfrom the Court of Appeals denying such motion, or (c) if such motion is granted, the conclusion of appellate proceedings before the Court of Appeals. The parties sha1l file a status report with this Court via ECF every 45 days to apprise the Court on the status of the State Court appellate proceedings in the foreclosure action. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/21/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Via Letter and Stipulation by Federal National Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Mordkoff, David)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re: Defendant's #7 Application for Pre-Motion Conference. The Application is GRANTED. The parties are instructed to confer and contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to schedule the pre-motion conference. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint is extended until fourteen days following the entry of the order deciding Defendant's anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/15/2019. (Kelly, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Federal National Mortgage Association for Federal National Mortgage Corporation. (Swanson, Adam)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference in Connection with Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Federal National Mortgage Corporation (Swanson, Adam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Federal National Mortgage Corporation (Mordkoff, David)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE:Defense Counsel is directed to forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. This section was not completed when this case was originally filed. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Michael Swanson on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Swanson, Adam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Declaration of Service by Federal National Mortgage Corporation (Mordkoff, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Corporation from New York Supreme Court, Richmond County, case number 151536/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11737541) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint) (Mordkoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmitt v. Federal National Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: David Steve Mordkoff
Represented By: Adam Michael Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH SCHMITT
Represented By: Richard A. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?