Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. v. Kissena Glatt Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.
Defendant: Kissena Glatt Farms LLC and Aaron Hirtz
Case Number: 1:2019cv04593
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: William F Kuntz
2 Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Blander on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Blander, Stuart)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Letter informing the court the case settled and requesting that the preliminary injunction hearing be vacated. Application granted. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/16/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David Lesly Jones is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 8/19/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to the Hon. William F. Kuntz II from attorney Craig A Stokes informing the court the case settled and requesting that the preliminary injunction hearing be vacated by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. (Stokes, Craig)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Lesly Jones Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11761008. by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit B - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Stokes, Craig)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. re #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Scheduling Order,,, #3 Affidavit in Support Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service by overnight mail, #2 Exhibit B - Personal service) (Stokes, Craig)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. Kissena Glatt Farms LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. Aaron Hirtz served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Stokes, Craig)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: On August 9, 2019, Plaintiff filed a motion for a temporary restraining order without notice and an order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue as to Defendants pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court HEREBY DENIES Plaintiffs request for a temporary restraining order and schedules an order to show cause hearing for Monday August 19, 2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6H North before the Honorable William F. Kuntz, II. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, Plaintiff s motions, and Plaintiffs supporting affidavit in or before August 14, 2019 at 5:00 PM. via overnight mail. Plaintiff is further directed to file notice with the Court of such service on Defendants and/or on any person, institution, or entity not a party to this action. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/12/2019. (Ramesar, Thameera)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/12/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Aaron summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Notice of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) (Stokes, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kissena Glatt Farms Online PACA Record) (Stokes, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Preliminary Injunction) (Stokes, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Affidavit of Plaintiff's Representative by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Stokes, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) (Stokes, Craig)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron Hirtz, Kissena Glatt Farms LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11746549 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement and Open Invoices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Kissena Glatt Farms LLC, #4 Summons to Aaron Hirtz) (Stokes, Craig) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/9/2019 per filer's request). (Layne, Monique).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp. v. Kissena Glatt Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kissena Glatt Farms LLC
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Hirtz
Represented By: Stuart A. Blander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Circus Fruits Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: Craig Alan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?