Windward Bora LLC v. Borodyansky et al
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Defendant: Vadim Borodyansky and Alla Rytova
Case Number: 1:2019cv04601
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: October 7, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: November 21, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: November 21, 2019. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: January 7, 2020. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): January 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: February 5, 2020. Joint pretrial order due by: March 9, 2020. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/7/2019. (Orenstein, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/7/2019. Scheduling: The next pretrial conference will be held on January 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Summary: Mr. Hasbani shall forthwith file a notice of appearance. The parties agree that discovery will primarily require the exchange of documents; neither side anticipates offering any expert opinion testimony. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery within three months. (Orenstein, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order for Discovery by Windward Bora LLC (Hasbani, Rafi)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss counterclaim of Defendants with MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint or stay proceedings filed by Vadim Borodyansky, Alla Rytova. (Villanti, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order By October 3, 2019, defendants shall file a letter with the Court, not to exceed three pages, setting forth the legal and factual bases on which they intend to rely to oppose plaintiff's proposed motion to dismiss defendants' second counterclaim, ( #15 ). Upon receipt of this filing, the Court will further advise the parties as to whether a pre-motion conference is required. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/26/2019. (Salvaggio, Kathryn)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for pre motion conference to dismiss counterclaim of Defendants by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint to Quiet Title, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer with Counterclaims) (Light, Danielle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Reply to Counterclaims in Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Windward Bora LLC. (Light, Danielle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Paula Light on behalf of Windward Bora LLC (aty to be noticed) (Light, Danielle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Danielle Paula Light (Light, Danielle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Alla Rytova served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Vadim Borodyansky served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, October 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than October 3, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/9/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM S against Windward Bora LLC by Alla Rytova, Vadim Borodyansky. (Villanti, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vadim Borodyansky, Alla Rytova. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Windward Bora LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vadim Borodyansky, Alla Rytova filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11748187 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit E, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora LLC v. Borodyansky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Represented By: Danielle Paula Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vadim Borodyansky
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Villanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alla Rytova
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Villanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?