Make the Road New York et al
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York and Center for Constitutional Rights
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) and Executive Office of Immigration Review
Case Number: 1:2019cv04607
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Executive Office of Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (Dharia, Ekta)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ekta Rajiv Dharia on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dharia, Ekta)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Make the Road New York, Center for Constitutional Rights. Executive Office of Immigration Review served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS") served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on USAO) (Schwarz, Ghita)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Austin on behalf of Center for Constitutional Rights, Make the Road New York (aty to be noticed) (Austin, Paige)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Thomas, Brittany)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED SUMMONS REISSUED as to the Executive Office of Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED SUMMONS REISSUED as to the Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED SUMMONS REISSUED as to the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED SUMMONS REISSUED as to the U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Center for Constitutional Rights, Make the Road New York (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Make the Road New York (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Make the Road New York (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Make the Road New York (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Center for Constitutional Rights, Make the Road New York (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Schwarz, Ghita)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11749142 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Make the Road New York, Center for Constitutional Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (First Requests), #2 Exhibit B (Second Requests), #3 Exhibit C (Third Request)) (Schwarz, Ghita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Make the Road New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By: Ekta R. Dharia
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS")
Represented By: Ekta R. Dharia
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Represented By: Ekta R. Dharia
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office of Immigration Review
Represented By: Ekta R. Dharia
Represented By: Alex Scott Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Paige Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Constitutional Rights
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Brittany Thomas
Represented By: Paige Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?