Johnson v. Hurwitz et al
Plaintiff: Jarmar Justice Johnson
Defendant: Herman Quay and Hugh Hurwitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv04674
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Referring Judge: Robert M Levy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hugh Hurwitz, Director of Federal Bureau of Prisons; Herman Quay, Warden of MDC Brooklyn. (Courtesy copies of the Summons, the Court's 8/20/2019 Electronic Order and Plaintiff's Complaint shall be sent to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York; the Attorney General of the United States in Washington, D.C.; and the Agency.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915 is hereby granted. The United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order upon defendants without prepayment of fees. The Clerk of Court shall also send a copy of my individual rules to plaintiff. For information regarding court procedures, plaintiff may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/20/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff). (Herrera, Isaiah)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy sent to plaintiff by U.S. mail. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/20/2019. (Levy, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jarmar Justice Johnson. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hugh Hurwitz, Herman Quay, filed by Jarmar Justice Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hurwitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Quay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarmar Justice Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?