Sherwood v. Selene Finance LP et al
Plaintiff: Clive Arnel Sherwood
Defendant: Selene Finance LP and Rebecca Breautigam
Case Number: 1:2019cv04731
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion to Withdraw. The court grants the plaintiff's motion withdraw his complaint and dismiss this case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to serve a copy of this order on the plaintiff, note service on the docket, and close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/10/2019. (Spriggs, Steven)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Mailing of ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for More Definite Statement by Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP (Rugino, Edward)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for More Definite Statement. The court terminates as moot the August 20, 2019 request in light of the plaintiff's expressed intent to dismiss this federal action. The defendants are directed to serve a copy of this order on the plaintiff and note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/9/2019. (Spriggs, Steven)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 Letter MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint by Clive Arnel Sherwood. (Herrera, Isaiah)
October 7, 2019 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 Pro Se Consent to Electronic Notification by Clive Arnel Sherwood. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Mailing of Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/3/2019 by Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP (Rugino, Edward)
October 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto:The court held a Pre-Motion Conference on 10/3/2019. The pro se plaintiff appeared, and the defendants were represented by Edward Rugino, Esq. The court discussed the basis for the defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. The plaintiff indicated that he would withdraw his federal court complaint and seek relief in state court regarding the matter. The court directed the plaintiff to file a letter withdrawing his complaint with the Clerk of Court by the close of business on October 7, 2019. The defendants are directed to serve a copy of this court order on the plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Court Reporter Rivka Teich.) (Spriggs, Steven)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Opposition to Deft's motion to dismiss, filed by Clive Arnel Sherwood. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clive Arnel Sherwood. Selene Finance LP served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP re #10 First MOTION for pre motion conference and extension of time to file an answer of Order granting #10 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference (Rugino, Edward)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Letter re Service of Order granting #10 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference by Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rugino, Edward)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. The court grants defendants' request for a pre-motion conference. The court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on October 3, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. The parties shall coordinate a call among themselves and dial into chambers (718-613-2180) when all parties are on the line. The plaintiff is directed to file a response to the defendant's pre-motion conference request by September 25, 2019. Defendants are respectfully directed to serve a copy of this order on the pro se plaintiff and note service on the docket. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/18/2019. (Spriggs, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for pre motion conference and extension of time to file an answer by Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rugino, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selene Finance LP identifying Corporate Parent Selene Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent Selene Ventures GP LLC, Corporate Parent Selene Holdings LLC for Selene Finance LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rugino, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Rugino on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rugino, Edward)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Selene Finance LP re #5 Summons Returned Executed of Rejection of Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service) (Rugino, Edward)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Honorable Kiyo A. Matsumoto assigned this case to me for all pretrial purposes. Enclosed is a copy of the "Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom." Plaintiff and defendants, alike, are required to follow these rules. Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order and the enclosed rules to defendants along with the summons and complaint. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to serve defendants and file proof of service with the Court. Accordingly, if proper service is not made upon defendants by 11/20/2019, or if plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by that date, it will be recommended that the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Plaintiff may choose to receive electronic notification of court issued filings in this civil case. If plaintiff is eligible and wishes to receive electronic notification of court issued documents, plaintiff should complete the attached Registration and Consent form and return the form to the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/22/2019. C/mailed w/Attachments: #1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, #2 Instruction for Pro Se Registration and Consent for Electronic Service of Orders and Notices Issued by the Court in Civil Cases, #3 Pro Se Registration and Consent Form. (Service upon Defendants due by 11/20/2019.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clive Arnel Sherwood. Selene Finance LP served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Galeano, Sonia)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Letter MOTION for More Definite Statement . Pltff request that Your Honor issue an order to suspend the sale date of his home on 8/23/19 set for 10:00 a.m., pending the outcome of trial, filed by Clive Arnel Sherwood. (Galeano, Sonia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 16, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653142786 (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rebecca Breautigam, Selene Finance LP, filed by Clive Arnel Sherwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherwood v. Selene Finance LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Edward Rugino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Breautigam
Represented By: Edward Rugino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clive Arnel Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?