DEVGRU Financial LLC v. Belgrave et al
Plaintiff: DEVGRU Financial LLC
Defendant: Jasmine I. Lynch, New York City Environmental Control Board, Jasmine Lynch, New York City Department of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau and Sandra Belgrave
Case Number: 1:2019cv04844
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Sandra Belgrave answer due 11/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/15/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to retain counsel, filed by Sandra Belgrave. (Layne, Monique)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEVGRU Financial LLC. Jasmine I. Lynch served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEVGRU Financial LLC. New York City Department of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEVGRU Financial LLC. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sandra Belgrave, Jasmine I. Lynch, New York City Department of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by DEVGRU Financial LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by DEVGRU Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEVGRU Financial LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra Belgrave, Jasmine I. Lynch, New York City Department of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Environmental Control Board filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11787832 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by DEVGRU Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit G, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEVGRU Financial LLC v. Belgrave et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine I. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Transportation Parking Violations Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Belgrave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVGRU Financial LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?