Osorio et al v. Vector Structural Preservation Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Raul Chavez Diaz, Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano, Wilder Rodriguez, Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango, Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon, Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez, Jesus Sierra, Arturo del Razo, Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio, Juan Sierra and Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez
Defendant: Vassilios Handakas, Bill Handakas, Vector Structural Preservation Corp., Sergio Doe and North Star Strategy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04896
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 12:30 p.m. on December 19, 2019 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than December 17th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/11/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Gayle Alicia Rosen on behalf of Bill Handakas, Vassilios Handakas, Vector Structural Preservation Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Rosen, Gayle)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Bill Handakas, Vassilios Handakas, Vector Structural Preservation Corp.. (Rabinowitz, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Bill Handakas answer due 10/12/2019; Vassilios Handakas answer due 10/12/2019; Vector Structural Preservation Corp. answer due 10/12/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/18/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bill Handakas, Vassilios Handakas, Vector Structural Preservation Corp.. (Rabinowitz, Michael)
September 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Marc Rabinowitz on behalf of Bill Handakas, Vassilios Handakas, Vector Structural Preservation Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Rabinowitz, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2019 The case of Osorio et al v. Vector Structural Preservation Corp. et al, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19cv4896. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07261. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 27, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #17 Letter filed by Raul Chavez Diaz, Juan Sierra, Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango, Jesus Sierra, Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Arturo del Razo, Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon, Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada, Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano, Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez, Wilder Rodriguez. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the above-captioned case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York and close it on the records of this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2019) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jesse S. Barton, Esq. dated August 19, 2019 re: Filing in SDNY in Error. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Barton, Jesse) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. Vector Structural Preservation Corp. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually); Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually); Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually); Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ramon Rosales Galvez(individually); Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated); Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually); Ramon Rosales Galvez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jesus Sierra(individually); Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually); Wilder Rodriguez(individually); Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated); Arturo del Razo(individually); Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually); Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated); Juan Sierra(individually); Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated); Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated); Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated); Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated); Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Raul Chavez Diaz(individually); Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. North Star Strategy, Inc. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually); Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually); Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually); Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Ramon Rosales Galvez(individually); Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated); Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated); Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually); Ramon Rosales Galvez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated); Jesus Sierra(individually); Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually); Wilder Rodriguez(individually); Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated); Arturo del Razo(individually); Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually); Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated); Juan Sierra(individually); Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated); Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated); Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated); Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated); Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Raul Chavez Diaz(individually); Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jesse S Barton on behalf of Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Barton, Jesse) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause by written affidavit why this action should not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The affidavit must be filed within fourteen days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/07/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vassilios Handakas. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill Handakas. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sergio Doe. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vector Structural Preservation Corp.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to North Star Strategy, Inc.. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: North Star Strategy, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ramon Rosales Galvez. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sergio Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vassilios Handakas, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bill Handakas, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to North Star Strategy, Inc. (d/b/a North Star Strategy), re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vector Structural Preservation Corp. (d/b/a Vector Structural Preservation), re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Ramon Rosales Galvez, Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Arturo del Razo(individually), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sergio Doe, Bill Handakas, Vassilios Handakas, North Star Strategy, Inc., Vector Structural Preservation Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17366517)Document filed by Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(individually), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(individually), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(individually), Wilder Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano(on behalf of others similarly situated), Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio(individually), Ramon Rosales Galvez, Juan Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Jesus Sierra(individually), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(individually), Wilder Rodriguez(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(on behalf of others similarly situated), Arturo del Razo(individually), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(individually), Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Sierra(individually), Jesus Sierra(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Arturo del Razo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada(on behalf of others similarly situated), Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Raul Chavez Diaz(individually), Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango(individually).(Faillace, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osorio et al v. Vector Structural Preservation Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Chavez Diaz
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Leandro Alulema Guano
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilder Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio Rolando Cashabamba Chango
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Segundo Nicolas Siguencia Encalada
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Rosales Galvez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Fabricio Cashabamba Tubon
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos E. Sierra Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Sierra
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo del Razo
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Manuel Zapata Osorio
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Sierra
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Salvador Barrera Sanchez
Represented By: Michael A. Faillace
Represented By: Jesse S. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vassilios Handakas
Represented By: Michael Marc Rabinowitz
Represented By: Gayle Alicia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Handakas
Represented By: Michael Marc Rabinowitz
Represented By: Gayle Alicia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector Structural Preservation Corp.
Represented By: Michael Marc Rabinowitz
Represented By: Gayle Alicia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Strategy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?