Wewe v. Mt. Sinai Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Paul T. Wewe
Defendant: Mt. Sinai Hospital, September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF) and World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP)
Case Number: 1:2019cv05000
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 Letter dated 10/28/19 from Paul Wewe to Clerk of the Court, re: Victims Compensation and Exhibit 3 enclosed. (Galeano, Sonia)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Letter dated 10/22/19 from Paul Wewe to Clerk of the Court, submitting this letter in support of the Court's Default entry made on 10/16/19. Pltff states his annual loss of earnings beginning in 2010, when pltff became disabled should be $72,000. (Galeano, Sonia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Mt. Sinai Hospital, World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP) has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Mt. Sinai Hospital, World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP) is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
October 16, 2019 REQUEST for Certificate of Default is denied at this time as to Defendant September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF) as untimely. A United States Agency has 60 days to answer a complaint. re #7 Request for Certificate of Default (Poveda, J.)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Paul T. Wewe (Marziliano, August)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Certificate of Default by Paul T. Wewe. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation In Support) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint by Paul T. Wewe. Mt. Sinai Hospital served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF) served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP) served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Love, Alexis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul T. Wewe. September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF) served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Herrera, Isaiah)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER -- This case has been assigned to me for all pretrial purposes. I respectfully direct each party to comply with my individual practice requirements, as well as those of the presiding judge, the Honorable Kiyo A. Matsumoto. The plaintiff has until December 2, 2019, to complete service on each defendant and file proof of service in court. If that doesn't happen, and if the plaintiff doesn't provide a good reason for the failure, I will recommend that the court dismiss this case without prejudice. You must promptly report any change of your address to the Clerk of Court. If you do not keep the court informed of your current address, we will not know where to contact you, and that may cause you to lose the case. For information about court procedures, a party who is not represented by a lawyer may contact the Pro Se Office at the United States Courthouse by calling (718) 613-2665 or by visiting the court's website at #www.nyed.uscourts.gov/self-representation. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/6/2019. c/m to plaintiff (Guy, Alicia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653143175 (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mt. Sinai Hospital, September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP). (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mt. Sinai Hospital, September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP), filed by Paul T. Wewe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wewe v. Mt. Sinai Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Sinai Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: September 11th Victim Compensation Fund (VCF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Trade Center Health and Monitor Program (WTC HP)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul T. Wewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?