Laser v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howard Scott Laser
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05024
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nina Gershon
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Diner on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Diner, Jesse)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jesse H. Diner is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant, American Airlines, Inc. He shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, Mr. Diner shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/31/2019. (Prentice, Amanda)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11995369. by American Airlines, Inc.. (Diner, Jesse)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mary Beth Ricke is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/23/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kelly H. Kolb is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendant.The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/23/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11969602. by American Airlines, Inc.. (Ricke, Mary Beth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number BNYEDC-11969065. by American Airlines, Inc.. (Kolb, Kelly)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant American Airlines, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 18, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/22/2019. (Prentice, Amanda)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Rivlin, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Scott Laser. American Airlines, Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (McKay, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to American Airlines, Inc.. (Barrett, C)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Howard Scott Laser (McKay, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. McKay on behalf of Howard Scott Laser (notification declined or already on case) (McKay, John)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney John D. McKay is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff Howard Scott Laser. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/17/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 (Notarized) AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John D. McKay), Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Howard Scott Laser (Davis, Kimberly)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice.The attached affidavit filed at #3 is not notarized. Counsel is directed to file a 'notarized' affidavit in support of his pro hac vice motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 9/5/2019. (Riquelme, Claudia)
September 4, 2019 PRO HAC VICE FILING FEE (Paid) : $ 150.00, receipt number 4653143194 (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (John D. McKay) by Howard Scott Laser. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653143193 (Davis, Kimberly)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc., filed by Howard Scott Laser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laser v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Scott Laser
Represented By: John D. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Represented By: Kelly Haze Kolb
Represented By: Jesse Diner
Represented By: Daniel Z. Rivlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?