Ildefonso v. Rubin & Rothman, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carmelo Ildefonso, Jr.
Defendant: Rubin & Rothman, LLC and Scott H. Rumph
Case Number: 1:2019cv05053
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Adjourn Conference: In light of the pending motion before the District Court, the conference scheduled for October 30th before the undersigned is canceled. Counsel for Defendants shall immediately forward a copy of this Order to the Plaintiff and file proof of service with the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/21/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Rubin & Rothman, LLC. (Arleo, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court construes #10 Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference as a motion for judgment on the pleadings and sets the following expedited briefing schedule: Defendants may supplement their motion with a letter of no more than five (5) pages by 10/31/2019; Plaintiff may respond with a letter of no more than five (5) pages by 11/7/2019; Defendants may file a reply, not to exceed three (3) pages by 11/14/2019. Oral argument on the motion shall take place on 1/16/2020, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/17/2019. (Shi, Yi Qing)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by pro se Carmelo Ildefonso, Jr. Rubin & Rothman, LLC served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Scott H. Rumph served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference for purpose of obtaining permission to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings by Rubin & Rothman, LLC. (Arleo, Robert)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The plaintiff in this case is proceeding pro se. Accordingly, an in-person initial conference will be held at 12:00 p.m. on October 30, 2019 before United States Magistrate Judge Steven L. Tiscione, in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All parties must be present. A completed discovery plan worksheet is not necessary. The Court will confer with the parties during the conference and set a schedule at that time. Requests for adjournment must be made in accordance with chambers individual rules or they will not be considered by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/3/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (Arleo, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Arleo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Arleo, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This case has been randomly assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial purposes. Attached is a copy of the AIndividual Practice Rules of Magistrate Judge Steven L. Tiscione. Plaintiff shall promptly advise the court once the defendants have been served. If service is not made upon the defendants by December 4, 2019, or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action withoutprejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/16/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653143267 (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rubin & Rothman, LLC, Scott H. Rumph, filed by Carmelo Ildefonso, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ildefonso v. Rubin & Rothman, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin & Rothman, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott H. Rumph
Represented By: Robert L. Arleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmelo Ildefonso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?