Harris v. Scola
Plaintiff: Laquan Devota Harris
Defendant: John A. Scola
Case Number: 1:2019cv05059
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 269 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Deputy Clerk Jalitza Poveda on 10/28/2019. (Copy of Judgment and appeals packet mailed to Pro Se at address listed). (Herrera, Isaiah)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The deadline to file an amended complaint has passed, and the plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment dismissing this case. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/25/2019. (Lefkowitz, Jacob)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Any state law claims are dismissed without prejudice to bring them in the proper state court or administrative agency. The Court grants the plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended complaint must allege claims arising under federal law, or, if under state law, the amended complaint must include allegations that the parties are citizens of different states, and that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. If the plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the complaint will be dismissed and judgment will enter. No summonses will issue at this time, and all further proceedings will be stayed for 30 days. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/19/2019. (Greene, Donna)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laquan Devota Harris. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John A. Scola, filed by Laquan Devota Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Scola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Scola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquan Devota Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?