M.O. et al v. New York City Department Of Education,
Plaintiff: M. O.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv05104
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 9, 2019 The case of M.O. et al v. New York City Department of Education, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 19-cv-5104. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-07174. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 26, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Upon reviewing Plaintiff's complaint, the Court notes that all of the events giving rise to Plaintiff's claims took place in or around Kings County, New York. This case, therefore, appears to be properly venued in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Accordingly, this action is hereby ORDERED transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/26/2019) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Letter Motion for Conference. Defendant's application for the Court to set a briefing schedule for Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss and adjourn the pre-motion conference currently scheduled for September 12, 2019, is DENIED. The Court will consider a briefing schedule for Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss at the pre-motion conference. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/21/2019) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #7 Letter, reply addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Martin Bowe dated Aug. 20, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,.(Bowe, Martin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's letter seeking a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss (Dkt. #6), and Plaintiff's letter in partial opposition. The Court GRANTS Defendant's application for a pre-motion conference. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear on September 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/19/2019) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jason H. Sterne dated August 19, 2019 re: Defendant's request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by M. O.(individually), M. O.(on behalf of N.O., a child with a disability).(Sterne, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference premotion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Martin Bowe dated Aug. 16, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,.(Bowe, Martin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,. (Bowe, Martin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sterne, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by M. O.(individually), M. O.(on behalf of N.O., a child with a disability). (Sterne, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17348597)Document filed by M. O.(individually), M. O.(on behalf of N.O., a child with a disability).(Sterne, Jason) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.O. et al v. New York City Department Of Education,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. O.
Represented By: Jason Hale Sterne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Martin John Bowe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?