Neal v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Keith Neal
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05436
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2019. Appearances: Philip Vogt, Esq., for Plaintiff; Christopher Yodice, Esq., for Defendant. Case settled. Parties are directed to file a Stipulation of Dismissal by 12/23/2019. (FTR Log #Not Recorded) (Townsend, McCahey)
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2019. Appearances: Philip Vogt, Esq., for Plaintiff; Christopher Yodice, Esq., for Defendant. Discussions held regarding settlement. Telephone Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. The parties are directed to use the toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 and access code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference. (Townsend, McCahey)
November 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/6/2019. Case called. Appearances and discussions held on the record. The parties are considering the Court's settlement recommendation and directed to inform the Court immediately if their clients accepts. Telephone Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties are directed to use the toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 and access code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference.(FTR Log #11:33:11-11:43:10.) (Vertus, Miriam)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Patrick Vogt on behalf of Keith Neal (notification declined or already on case) (Vogt, Philip)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Keith Neal (Chiatto, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 11/1/2019. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/21/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11879789 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Keith Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Neal
Represented By: Philip Patrick Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?