Pickett v. United States of America
Petitioner: Gordon Pickett
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv05536
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #4 Notice of Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Clerk's Judgment and Electronic Order of 10/11/19, by Gordon Pickett. No fee paid. IFP denied for purposes of appeal. A Certificate of Appealability is also denied. Document also reflects 99-cr-1152. (McGee, Mary Ann)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT that the petition for a writ of coram nobis is denied; that no certificate of appealability shall issue, 28 U.S.C. 2253(c); and that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 10/15/2019. (copy of judgment with appeals packet mailed to: Gordon Pickett, #50695-053, FMC Devens - Federal Medical Center, Satellite Camp, P.O. Box 879, Ayer, MA 01432) (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Gordon Pickett, proceeding pro se, petitions for a writ of error coram nobis vacating his September 20, 2000 guilty plea and conviction in United States v. Pickett, No. 99-CR-1152 (E.D.N.Y.). Petitioner's motion #2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED solely for the purpose of this order. By memorandum and order dated November 1, 2018, this Court denied a substantially similar petition in Pickett v. United States, No. 18-CV-2560. Subsequently, on June 12, 2019, the Court denied Petitioner's motion for reconsideration of that decision, and, on July 22, the Second Circuit dismissed his appeal (No. 18-3459) because it lacked an arguable basis in either law or fact. The instant petition differs from the 2018 petition only in that Petitioner now claims he is actually innocent of the charges to which he pleaded guilty in 2000, and he now raises and ineffective-assistance claim. However, the factual bases for his claims and his delay in asserting them are identical to those set forth in his prior petition. Accordingly, this petition is DENIED as untimely and, in any event, meritless for the same reasons discussed in the Court's November 1, 2018 memorandum and order in Pickett, No. 18-CV-2560. See Foont v. United States, 93 F.3d 76, 80 (2d Cir. 1996) (holding that the "critical inquiry" as to timeliness is whether the petitioner "knew or should have known" earlier of facts underlying his claim for coram nobis relief). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Because Petitioner has not "made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right," the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se litigant, enter judgment, and close this case. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/11/2019. (Valderrama, Freddie) Modified on 10/11/2019 (Valderrama, Freddie).
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gordon Pickett. (Davis, Kimberly)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis , filed by Gordon Pickett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Davis, Kimberly) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gordon Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?