Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Axial Chiropractic P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co. and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Axial Chiropractic P.C., Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C., Archer Irby, D.C., Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C., Bruce Bromberg, D.C., Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., David Marcus Coty, D.C., Robert Luca, D.C. and Action Chiropractic P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05570
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Robert Luca, DC. (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C., Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, DC. (Nof, Eitan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C., Lawrence Lefcort, D.C.. (Levine, Ira)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 11:30 a.m. on January 7, 2020 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendants' counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Robert Luca, DC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/12/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Robert Luca, DC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Robert Luca, DC (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C. and Glenn Rosenberg, DC shall answer move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/30/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/5/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C. and Lawrence Lefcort, D.C. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/5/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 5, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C., Glenn Rosenberg, DC. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Nof, Eitan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Santora on behalf of Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C., Glenn Rosenberg, DC (aty to be noticed) (Santora, John)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eitan Nof on behalf of Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C., Glenn Rosenberg, DC (aty to be noticed) (Nof, Eitan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. Robert Luca, DC served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C., Lawrence Lefcort, D.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levine, Ira)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Levine on behalf of Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C., Lawrence Lefcort, D.C. (aty to be noticed) (Levine, Ira)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co.. Lawrence Lefcort, D.C. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Glenn Rosenberg, DC served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Bruce Bromberg, DC served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. David Marcus Coty, DC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Archer Irby, DC served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Action Chiropractic P.C. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. Axial Chiropractic P.C. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION #7 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 10/8/2019. (Marziliano, August)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically on October 2, 2019. by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gershenoff, Max)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Yonatan Bernstein on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (notification declined or already on case) (Bernstein, Yonatan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Henesy on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (aty to be noticed) (Henesy, Steven)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Marziliano, August)
October 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Casualty Co., Geico Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Gershenoff, Max)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Marziliano, August)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Action Chiropractic P.C., Axial Chiropractic P.C., Bruce Bromberg, DC, David Marcus Coty, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C. d/b/a South Shore Spinal Care, Archer Irby, DC, Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C., Robert Luca, DC, Glenn Rosenberg, DC, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Co., Geico Casualty Co., Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Fee) (Marziliano, August) Modified on 10/2/2019 (Marziliano, August). ANYEDC-11903166 $400.00 (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/2/2019) (Marziliano, August). (Attachment 7 replaced on 10/2/2019) (Marziliano, August).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Axial Chiropractic P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axial Chiropractic P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Rosenberg, D.C., P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Irby, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lefcort MUA Chiropractic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bromberg, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Rosenberg, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marcus Coty, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Luca, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Chiropractic P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Casualty Co.
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Max Saulter Gershenoff
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Steven Henesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?