United States of America v. The Real Property and Premises Known as Deed No. 18,877 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as Deed No. 18,877, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8186, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8187, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 84, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 2576, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8527 and The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 9859
Case Number: 1:2019cv05748
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Affidavit of publication, legal notice was published on the official government website www.forfeiture.gov, beginning on October 24, 2019 and ending on November 22, 2019. (King, Brendan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Unseal, Upon the application of RICHARD P. DONOGHUE, United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York, by Assistant United States Attorney Brendan G. King, for an order unsealing the Verified Complaint in rem and Order in the above- captioned matter WHEREFORE, it is ordered that the Verified Complaint in rem and Order be unsealed. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Real Property and Premises Known as Deed No. 18,877, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 2576, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8186, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8187, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 84, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8527, The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 9859, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealing Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Real Property and Premises Known as Deed No. 18,877 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as Deed No. 18,877
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8186
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8187
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 84
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 2576
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 8527
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property and Premises Known as: Deed No. 9859
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brendan G King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?