Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Direct RX Pharmacy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Rafo Yaguda, Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D., Robert Yakutilov, Richard Jay Apple, M.D., Rafail Yagudayev, Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., John Does Nos. "1" Through "5" and Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05876
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, endorsed on doc.#25 . The application is granted. Responses shall be filed by 1/6/20. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 12/10/2019. (Direct RX Pharmacy Inc.'s answer due 1/6/2020; Rafo Yaguda's answer due 1/6/2020.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., Rafo Yaguda. (Harfenist, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil S. Torczyner on behalf of Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., Rafo Yaguda (aty to be noticed) (Torczyner, Neil)
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Harfenist on behalf of Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., Rafo Yaguda (aty to be noticed) (Harfenist, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, MD served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ANSWER, endorsed on doc.#19 . It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties herein that time for the defendant JEAN-PIERRE GEORGES BARAKAT, M.D. ("Defendant") to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby adjourned on consent until December 20, 2019. SO ORDERED Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 11/27/2019. (See document for details; Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat's answer due by 12/20/2019.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., Rafo Yaguda by Robert Yakutilov. (Murray, E.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 20, 2019 by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Abreu, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Paul Bowers on behalf of Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, MD (aty to be noticed) (Bowers, Nicholas)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Rafo Yaguda served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, MD served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Richard Jay Apple, MD served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Robert Yakutilov served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry I. Levy on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Levy, Barry)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Smith on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Joshua)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla DeLing Kam on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Kam, Priscilla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Abreu on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Abreu, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Christopher Murray on behalf of Robert Yakutilov (aty to be noticed) (Murray, E.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Elise Della Ragione on behalf of Robert Yakutilov (aty to be noticed) (Della Ragione, Nicole)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Direct RX Pharmacy Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Sirignano, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Sirignano, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed ***(2 PAGE FORM)*** Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Sirignano, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Jay Apple, MD, Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, MD, Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, MD, Direct RX Pharmacy Inc., John Does Nos. "1" Through "5", Rafo Yaguda, Robert Yakutilov filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11954909 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Fraudulent Claims Identified To-Date, #4 Exhibit 2 - Representative Sample of the Prescriptions Submitted) (Sirignano, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. Direct RX Pharmacy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafo Yaguda
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Antonio Delacruz-Gomez, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Yakutilov
Represented By: Nicole Elise Della Ragione
Represented By: E. Christopher Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Jay Apple, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafail Yagudayev
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct RX Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Neil S. Torczyner
Represented By: Steven J. Harfenist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. "1" Through "5"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre Georges Barakat, M.D.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Jennifer Abreu
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Jennifer Abreu
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Jennifer Abreu
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Represented By: Joshua D Smith
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Jennifer Abreu
Represented By: Priscilla DeLing Kam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?