Frenkel v. Salamon et al
Plaintiff: Mark Frenkel
Defendant: E-Commerce Expand, LLC, Yehuda I. Salamon, Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC, Riverstone, USA, LLC, Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc., Alla Kachan, John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 10 and David Salamon
Case Number: 1:2019cv05902
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the defendant's proposed motion to dismiss. To request a pre-motion conference, the moving party must file and serve a letter not to exceed three pages setting out the bases for the anticipated motion by December 6, 2019. All parties served must serve and file a letter response, not to exceed three pages, within seven days of service of the notification letter. The parties should consult my Individual Practices and Rules for additional information. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/25/2019. (Lupo, Brandi)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Nicole Burke on behalf of Mark Frenkel (aty to be noticed) (Burke, Jamie)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David K. Fiveson on behalf of Mark Frenkel (notification declined or already on case) (Fiveson, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Bankruptcy Court AP case number 1-19-1120. by E-Commerce Expand, LLC, Riverstone, USA, LLC, David Salamon, Yehuda I. Salamon, Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC, Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 1-Complaint, #2 12-Motion for Withdrawl of Reference, #3 14-Affidavit/Certicate of Service) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenkel v. Salamon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Commerce Expand, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yehuda I. Salamon
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: Karamvir Dahiya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidel's Online Food Station, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverstone, USA, LLC
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yidel's Shopping Cart, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alla Kachan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1 through John Doe No. 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salamon
Represented By: Phillip Mahony
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Frenkel
Represented By: David K. Fiveson
Represented By: Jamie Nicole Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?