Vasquez v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Vasquez
Defendant: Success Academy Prospect Heights, Jarett Posner, Success Academy Board of Trustees Samuel A. Cole, Gregory Sawers, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Bryan Binder, Chief Executive Officer Eva Moskowitz, Derrell Bradford, Suleman Lunat, Edwin Cespedes, Lorenzo Smith, III, Sydney Chernoff-Solomon, Brian Levine, Andrew D Stone, Scott Friedman and John Doe 1-4
Case Number: 1:2019cv05997
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0794
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Bryan Binder, Derrell Bradford, Edwin Cespedes, Sydney Chernoff-Solomon, Scott Friedman, Brian Levine, Suleman Lunat, Chief Executive Officer Eva Moskowitz, Jarett Posner, Gregory Sawers, Lorenzo Smith, III, Andrew D Stone, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Success Academy Board of Trustees Samuel A. Cole, Success Academy Prospect Heights. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons) (Ramesar, Thameera)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER: By November 20,2019 the plaintiff shall file a letter explaining why he has not requested that summons be issued in the action.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/13/2019. (Innelli, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Lisa Vasquez (Glickman, Leo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan Binder, Derrell Bradford, Edwin Cespedes, Sydney Chernoff-Solomon, Scott Friedman, Brian Levine, Suleman Lunat, Chief Executive Officer Eva Moskowitz, Jarett Posner, Gregory Sawers, Lorenzo Smith, III, Andrew D Stone, Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., Success Academy Board of Trustees Samuel A. Cole, Success Academy Prospect Heights filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11978029 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lisa Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Glickman, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Prospect Heights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarett Posner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Board of Trustees Samuel A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Executive Officer Eva Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrell Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suleman Lunat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Cespedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzo Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sydney Chernoff-Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Vasquez
Represented By: Leo Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?