Shiro v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nikolai Shiro
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06046
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated pursuant to plaintiff's Rule 41 notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/11/2019. (Cogan, Brian)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nikolai Shiro with Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Kroub, Edward)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties Equifax Information Services, LLC and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., pursuant to plaintiff's notice that he has settled with these two parties, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/11/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement with Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Nikolai Shiro (Kroub, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement with Equifax Information Services, LLC by Nikolai Shiro (Kroub, Edward)
December 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Brownstein, Boris)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nikolai Shiro. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Kroub, Edward)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Brigandi on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Brigandi, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nikolai Shiro. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting defendant Wells Fargo Bank's #12 Motion for Extension of Time to file its answer to 12/30/2019. However, the Initial Status Conference previously set for 12/19/2019 will proceed as scheduled since Court does not wait for answers to be filed as they are not required in planning discovery set at the conference. The parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Margarella, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., filed by Nikolai Shiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 defendant Wells Fargo's Motion for Extension of Time to file its Answer to 12/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/14/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Margarella, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Margarella, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael V. Margarella on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Margarella, Michael)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Daniel Klein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Jonathan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nikolai Shiro. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Kroub, Edward)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 12/19/2019 at 4:45 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/30/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Davis, Kimberly).
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11984058 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Nikolai Shiro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Kroub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiro v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Boris Brownstein
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael V. Margarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Brigandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolai Shiro
Represented By: Edward Y. Kroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?