Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. VVX, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company and Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Haiyin Hua, M.D., Shamrock Medical, P.C., Graig Granovsky, D.C., Yefim Klikshteyn, Yang Zhi Gang, D.O., Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C., VVX, Inc. and Haihu Medical, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06048
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Motion for Defendants VVX, Inc., and Yefim Klikshteyn Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 1/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/26/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 26, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Yefim Klikshteyn, VVX, Inc.. (Carton, Ruya)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 1/24/2020. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/26/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 26, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, MD. (Conroy, Matthew)
December 26, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Yang Zhi Gang, DO, Shamrock Medical, P.C.. (Conroy, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Graig Granovsky, DC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Graig Granovsky, DC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for Graig Granovsky Chiropractic) (Vanunu, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Certificate of Default by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Certificate of Default for Graig Granovsky, D.C., #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Manpower/Military Status) (Vanunu, Michael)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Defendants Yefim Klikshteyn, and VVX, Inc., Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 12/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/29/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruya Carton on behalf of Yefim Klikshteyn, VVX, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Carton, Ruya)
November 29, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Yefim Klikshteyn, VVX, Inc.. (Eisenberg, Lloyd)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #21 Motion for Defendants Yang Zhi Gang, D.O., Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, M.D., and Shamrock Medical, P.C., Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 12/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/25/2019. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by Yang Zhi Gang, DO, Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, MD, Shamrock Medical, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation) (Conroy, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Yang Zhi Gang, DO, Shamrock Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of Yang Zhi Gang, DO, Shamrock Medical, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Conroy on behalf of Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, MD (aty to be noticed) (Conroy, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Campese on behalf of Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, MD (aty to be noticed) (Campese, Maria)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd M. Eisenberg on behalf of Yefim Klikshteyn, VVX, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Eisenberg, Lloyd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Haihu Medical, P.C. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Shamrock Medical, P.C. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. VVX, Inc. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Yang Zhi Gang, DO served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Graig Granovsky, DC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Yefim Klikshteyn served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/28/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. Haiyin Hua, MD served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Levy, Barry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vanunu on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Vanunu, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Sirignano on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Sirignano, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/30/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Levy, Barry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yang Zhi Gang, DO, Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C., Graig Granovsky, DC, Haihu Medical, P.C., Haiyin Hua, MD, Yefim Klikshteyn, Shamrock Medical, P.C., VVX, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11984703 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - NO,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, Government Employees Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons and Rider, #3 Exhibit 1 - Representative Sample of Fraudulent Claims, #4 Exhibit 2 - New York State Insurance Department Opinion Letter dated June 16, 2004, #5 Exhibit 3 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions, #6 Exhibit 4 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions, #7 Exhibit 5 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions, #8 Exhibit 6 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions, #9 Exhibit 7 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions, #10 Exhibit 8 - Representative Sample of Prescriptions) (Levy, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company et al v. VVX, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haiyin Hua, M.D.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graig Granovsky, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yefim Klikshteyn
Represented By: Lloyd M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Ruya Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Zhi Gang, D.O.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graig Granovsky Chiropractic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VVX, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Ruya Carton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haihu Medical, P.C.
Represented By: Maria Campese
Represented By: Matthew J. Conroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Represented By: Michael Vanunu
Represented By: Michael A. Sirignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?