Lu v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Tianfa Lu
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Kevin McAleenan, District Director Thomas Cioppa, Director of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli and US Atty General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv06139
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants' #7 motion for a pre-motion conference is granted. The conference will be held on February 13, 2020 at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 4F North. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/26/2019. (Wisotsky, Shira)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, filed by Tianfa Lu. (Hu, Lewis)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by William Barr, Thomas Cioppa, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan. (Hughes, Jeanne)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Hughes on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Hughes, Jeanne)
November 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tianfa Lu. All Defendants. (Hu, Lewis)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11998378 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Tianfa Lu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix) (Hu, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lu v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of USCIS Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Atty General William Barr
Represented By: Jeanne Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianfa Lu
Represented By: Lewis Guangwei Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?