Labita v. Wagner College
Plaintiff: Patricia Labita
Defendant: Wagner College
Case Number: 1:2019cv06231
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Simi Bhutani on behalf of Wagner College (aty to be noticed) (Bhutani, Simi)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E Collyer on behalf of Wagner College (aty to be noticed) (Collyer, Adam)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia Labita. Wagner College waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Lowe, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wagner College. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Patricia Labita (aty to be noticed) (Isaacson, Sara)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Patricia Labita (Lowe, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Patricia Labita (Lowe, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wagner College filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12012007 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Patricia Labita. (Lowe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labita v. Wagner College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner College
Represented By: Adam E Collyer
Represented By: Simi Bhutani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Labita
Represented By: Sara Jacqueline Isaacson
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?